+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 357) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Harimoto.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/AEN/WTL, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.