+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 272) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ruderman.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/TRA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 195) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, English, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/TRA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/TRA/GVO, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor