+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 189, 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Act 189, on 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 656).
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 695).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 05-01-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 3) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 3).
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 11:05AM in conference room 225.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:05AM in conference room 225.
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628).
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Changed: Representative Yamane added as Conferee. Representative Say discharged as Conferee.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644).
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Green Co-Chair; Galuteria, Ihara, Wakai.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Say, Thielen.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 567).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1636) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 26) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from ENE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 542) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Gabbard, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-18-15 1:15PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 3:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/HTH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.