+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 5, 2019 in the House:
- Act 175, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 175, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 965).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-30-19.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 5).
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-19.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 4:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Kim, Fevella.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 589).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-04-19.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1919) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 348) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor