+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 276).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 03-05-13.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-01-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor