+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
- Reported from HSG/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, McDermott.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HSH on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSG/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 343) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 873) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:15PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:05PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor