+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 3:00PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor