+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 340) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor