+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 3:00PM; CR 329.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 3:15PM; CR 329.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Gates, Ward.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Keohokalole, Fevella.
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 538).
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (3) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1459) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, LoPresti.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-18-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 320) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 644) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 96) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, CPN.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.