+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 481).
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1817), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 19
- Pass First Reading
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 65) in amended form (SD 2).
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-24-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor