+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-25-15 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 261) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 873) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room CR414.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.