+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 10:15AM in conference room 325.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-15 10:15AM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Rhoads, Johanson Co-Chairs; Hashem, Tupola.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 560).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Woodson.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 923) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Tupola.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Inouye, Slom.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-05-15 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 9:00AM in conference room CR016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.