+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 137, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1237).
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Act 137, on 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1237).
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 124) as amended in (CD 1).
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 124).
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakashima, Tokioka, LoPresti, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 645).
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Taniguchi added as Conferee. Senator Galuteria discharged as Conferee.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Nakashima, Tokioka Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Ward.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Galuteria.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308.
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1149), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, Tupola.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:45AM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 03-18-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-06-15.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-19-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Taniguchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TSI, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor