+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 046, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Act 046, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 106) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 106).
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Cullen, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 4:35PM in conference room 224.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 4:35PM in conference room 224.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 4:35PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, McKelvey, Cullen, Wildberger Co-Chairs; McDermott.
- Re-referred to EEP, EDB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 56
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 764).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2140) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/EDB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 328) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 947) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.