+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 176) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor