+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 9:00AM in conference room 329.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor