+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1942), recommending adoption.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered