+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 663).
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-24-15.
- Waived referral to HTH.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to HTH.
- Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616), with recommendation of referral to HTH.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-15 2:50PM in conference room 225.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE, HTH.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 390).
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Yamane.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-24-15 11:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-15.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-15 8:30AM in conference room 325.
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.