+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on EDN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to EDN.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 9:30AM in conference room 309.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.