+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1555-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-22-18 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor