+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 04-05-13 11:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on EDB as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Jordan, Kawakami, McKelvey, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1391) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to EDB.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Coffman, Evans; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, EDB, referral sheet 37
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor