+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1453-14), recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Kobayashi, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234-14), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 9:00AM in conference room 329.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor