+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-24-14 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor