+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 25
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor