+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/CPN.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 454).
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1414-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:05PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-14 at 2:00pm.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:10PM in conference room 325.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 at 2:00 pm in conference room 325.
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 42
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Kobayashi, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC .
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.