+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/TRE, WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 436).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1497-16), recommending adoption.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-06-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-04-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1378-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-17-16 8:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 27
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor