+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 666) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-24-15.
- Reported from WTL/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1670) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-15 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/EDT.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1484), recommending adoption.
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387).
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1332) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 325.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 34.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.