+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1763), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL, referral sheet 24
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/EEP, referral sheet 20
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor