+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1839), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- To be offered.