+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 312.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor