+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Fale voting no (1) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1690) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 37
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor