+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1535), recommending adoption.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1188), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Yamashita.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 03-18-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 25
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor