+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-18-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 23
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.