+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with Representative(s) Awana, Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447-14), recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Kawakami.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-14 at 10:30am.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-21-14 10:05AM in conference room 325.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-14.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor