+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1225), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 03-18-13 9:35AM in conference room 312.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 12
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor