+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1114), recommending referral to JHA.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-11-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 15
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor