+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from PVM/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1835), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Say, Yamane.
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:05PM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor