+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1849-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-03-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1567-18), recommending referral to CPC.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 39
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor