+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-22-17 11:30AM in conference room 423.
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-17.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-17-17 11:15AM in conference room 423.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.