+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1265), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Thielen.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-25-13 9:00AM in conference room 325.
- Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 43
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 37
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor