+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 325.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor