+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 718) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from THA/PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1607) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
- The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on THA/PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 312.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to THA/PSM/JDL.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 460).
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1483) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2).
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929), recommending referral to JUD.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, C. Lee.
On February 9, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:50AM in conference room 325.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 12
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor