+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608), recommending adoption.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor