+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 429.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 24
- Offered
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.