+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311), recommending referral to HED.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, HED, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor