+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1694), recommending adoption.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takai, Cheape, Fale.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 04-10-13 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to EDN.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ohno, McDermott.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, EDN, referral sheet 37
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor