+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from EDN/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1501), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ing.
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN/HED on Wednesday, 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 309.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN/HED, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor