+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-16 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 425).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1322-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Nakashima, McDermott.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 2:00PM.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-14-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 23
- Offered
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor