+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, Takai excused (2).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-29-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1718-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 308.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 309.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1299-14), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Takai, Matsumoto.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-17-14 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor