+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1139-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-17-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 23
- Offered
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.